THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:18:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Umea University Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN, SWEDISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205 Hiram Street
Cottage Country Family Health Team
Bracebridge Ontario P1L
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 645-2223
Fax: (705) 645-5286
Address: 75 Ann Street
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 95 Pine Street
The Pines Long Term Care Home
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 1K8
Phone: 705-645-4488
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. MANSOUB BASIRI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mansoub Basiri (CPSO#: 155157 )
Business Address: 205 Hiram Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2C1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN, SWEDISH
Medical School: Umea University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205 Hiram Street
Cottage Country Family Health Team
Bracebridge Ontario P1L
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 645-2223
Fax: (705) 645-5286
Address: 75 Ann Street
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 95 Pine Street
The Pines Long Term Care Home
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 1K8
Phone: 705-645-4488
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. MANSOUB BASIRI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mansoub Basiri (CPSO#: 155157 )
Business Address: 205 Hiram Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2C1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Nov 2024
29 Nov 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 30 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 29 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MANOSH MANSOUB BASIRI may practise family medicine at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Cottage Country Family Health Team in Bracebridge, Ontario;

(ii) South Muskoka Memorial Hospital in Bracebridge, Ontario;

(iii) The Pines Long Term Care Home in Bracebridge, Ontario; and

(iv) in accordance with Dr. MANSOUB BASIRI’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. Mansoub Basiri signed on December 15, 2023, and

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance; or

(ii) when Dr. MANSOUB BASIRI’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada’s examination expires

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MANSOUB BASIRI’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MANSOUB BASIRI’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 30 November, 2024, and will expire on or before 29 November, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MANOSH MANSOUB BASIRI may practise family medicine at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) Cottage Country Family Health Team in Bracebridge, Ontario;

(ii) South Muskoka Memorial Hospital in Bracebridge, Ontario;

(iii) The Pines Long Term Care Home in Bracebridge, Ontario; and

(iv) in accordance with Dr. MANSOUB BASIRI’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. Mansoub Basiri signed on December 15, 2023, and

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance; or

(ii) when Dr. MANSOUB BASIRI’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada’s examination expires

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MANSOUB BASIRI’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MANSOUB BASIRI’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 30 November, 2024, and will expire on or before 29 November, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Umea University Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 29 Nov 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024