THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:44:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ilorin College of Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1366 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3434781009
Fax: 3434791009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR BABATUNDE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Babatunde (CPSO#: 155170 )
Business Address: 1366 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3Z4
3434781009
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YORUBA
Medical School: University of Ilorin College of Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1366 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 3434781009
Fax: 3434791009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jan 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 08 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR BABATUNDE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Babatunde (CPSO#: 155170 )
Business Address: 1366 Clyde Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3Z4
3434781009
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL OLUSEUN BABATUNDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABATUNDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL OLUSEUN BABATUNDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABATUNDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ilorin College of Health Sciences, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2024