THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:39:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Isfahan University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 131 Howland Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 29 Main Street East
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2C6
Phone: 000000000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Minerva Street East
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1P2
Phone: 7057891744
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 330 Columbia St E
New Westminster BC V3L 3W7
Phone: (604)520-4253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. S. BATAYEE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Batayee (CPSO#: 155188 )
Business Address: 131 Howland Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2P7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Isfahan University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 131 Howland Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 29 Main Street East
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2C6
Phone: 000000000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Minerva Street East
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1P2
Phone: 7057891744
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 330 Columbia St E
New Westminster BC V3L 3W7
Phone: (604)520-4253
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. S. BATAYEE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Batayee (CPSO#: 155188 )
Business Address: 131 Howland Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 2P7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Sep 2024
23 Sep 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 24 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 23 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Saeedehsadat Batayee may practise family medicine only at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) 131 Howland Drive in Huntsville, Ontario;

(ii) Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare – Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Site in Huntsville, Ontario; and

(iii) in accordance with Dr. Saeedehsadat Batayee’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. Batayee signed on December 22, 2023.


2. The certificate of registration automatically expires the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance;

(ii) when Dr. Batayee’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada’s
examination expires

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. Batayee’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. Batayee’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 24 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 23 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Saeedehsadat Batayee may practise family medicine only at the following locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

(i) 131 Howland Drive in Huntsville, Ontario;

(ii) Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare – Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Site in Huntsville, Ontario; and

(iii) in accordance with Dr. Saeedehsadat Batayee’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. Batayee signed on December 22, 2023.


2. The certificate of registration automatically expires the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance;

(ii) when Dr. Batayee’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada’s
examination expires

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. Batayee’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. Batayee’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 24 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 23 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Isfahan University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 23 Sep 2027

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2024