THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:51:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 369 Mary Street
Wiarton Ontario N0H 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-534-1260
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. R. FARHOUD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Farhoud (CPSO#: 155201 )
Business Address: Mary Street
Wiarton Ontario N0H 2T0
5195342411

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 369 Mary Street
Wiarton Ontario N0H 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-534-1260
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 17 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. R. FARHOUD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Farhoud (CPSO#: 155201 )
Business Address: Mary Street
Wiarton Ontario N0H 2T0
5195342411

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Oct 2024
16 Oct 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 17 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Oct 16 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Amir Reza Farhoud may practise family medicine only,

(i) In accordance with Dr. Amir Reza Farhoud’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service
Agreement that Dr. Farhoud signed on December 18, 2023, and

(ii) at Brightshores Health System – Wiarton Site in Wiarton, Ontario while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance;

(ii) when Dr. Farhoud’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada’s
examination expires

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. Farhoud’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. Farhoud’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 October, 2024, and will expire on or before 16 October, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Amir Reza Farhoud may practise family medicine only,

(i) In accordance with Dr. Amir Reza Farhoud’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service
Agreement that Dr. Farhoud signed on December 18, 2023, and

(ii) at Brightshores Health System – Wiarton Site in Wiarton, Ontario while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance;

(ii) when Dr. Farhoud’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada’s
examination expires

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. Farhoud’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. Farhoud’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 17 October, 2024, and will expire on or before 16 October, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Oct 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 16 Oct 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 2024