THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke Ontario K8A 3K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137351089
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helia Ghanean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ghanean (CPSO#: 155202 )
Business Address: 315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke Ontario K8A 3K2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke Ontario K8A 3K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137351089
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Helia Ghanean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ghanean (CPSO#: 155202 )
Business Address: 315 Pembroke Street East
Pembroke Ontario K8A 3K2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Sep 2024
20 Sep 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 21 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 20 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HELIA GHANEAN may practise family medicine only,

(i) in accordance with Dr. HELIA GHANEAN's Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. GHANEAN signed on December 21, 2023, and

(ii) at West Champlain Family Health Team in Pembroke, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(iii) at Pembroke Regional Hospital in Pembroke, Ontario while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on September 20, 2027, or when Dr. Ghanean’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. GHANEAN’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. GHANEAN’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 21 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 20 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. HELIA GHANEAN may practise family medicine only,

(i) in accordance with Dr. HELIA GHANEAN's Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. GHANEAN signed on December 21, 2023, and

(ii) at West Champlain Family Health Team in Pembroke, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(iii) at Pembroke Regional Hospital in Pembroke, Ontario while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College:

2. The certificate of registration will automatically expire on September 20, 2027, or when Dr. Ghanean’s eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada examination expires, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. GHANEAN’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. GHANEAN’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 21 September, 2024, and will expire on or before 20 September, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University Tehran Faculty of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 20 Sep 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 20 Sep 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2024