THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:58:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jaffna Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 672b Main Street
Sauble Beach Ontario N0H 2G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 422-1321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Physician Assistant Canada - Manitoba
PROFESSION: Physician Assistant
JURISDICTION: Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.MYLASHAN MYLVAGANAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mylvaganam (CPSO#: 155208 )
Business Address: 672b Main Street
Sauble Beach Ontario N0H 2G0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Jaffna Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 672b Main Street
Sauble Beach Ontario N0H 2G0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 422-1321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Nov 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sri Lanka

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Physician Assistant Canada - Manitoba
PROFESSION: Physician Assistant
JURISDICTION: Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR.MYLASHAN MYLVAGANAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mylvaganam (CPSO#: 155208 )
Business Address: 672b Main Street
Sauble Beach Ontario N0H 2G0

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Nov 2024
25 Nov 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 26 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Nov 25 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MYLASHAN MYLVAGANAM may practise family medicine only:

(i) with Sauble Family Health Team in Sauble Beach, Ontario while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(ii) in accordance with Dr. MYLVAGANAM’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. MYLVAGANAM signed on December 14, 2023.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance;

(ii) when Dr. MYLVAGANAM's eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada’s examination expires.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MYLVAGANAM’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MYLVAGANAM’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 26 November, 2024, and will expire on or before 25 November, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MYLASHAN MYLVAGANAM may practise family medicine only:

(i) with Sauble Family Health Team in Sauble Beach, Ontario while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College; and

(ii) in accordance with Dr. MYLVAGANAM’s Return of Service Agreement with the Crown in Right of the Province of Ontario and the Addendum to the Return of Service Agreement that Dr. MYLVAGANAM signed on December 14, 2023.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires the earlier of:

(i) three years from the date of issuance;

(ii) when Dr. MYLVAGANAM's eligibility to take the College of Family Physicians of Canada’s examination expires.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr. MYLVAGANAM’s knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the required reports to the College by the due date or if the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(ii) the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to supervise Dr. MYLVAGANAM’s practice.

Note: This certificate is issued on 26 November, 2024, and will expire on or before 25 November, 2027, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jaffna Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 25 Nov 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2024