THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:49:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 23 Main Street South
WATERFORD FAMILY HEALTH CENTRE
Waterford Ontario N0E 1Y0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194436694
Fax: 5199005740

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Effective June 1, 2025, patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:

Avalon Walk-In Medical Clinic
34 Richard William Drive
Unit #2b
Caledonia, ON
N3W 0G8
Tel: 289-450-0359
Fax: 289-860-0708
Date Received: 08 Apr 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NCOBANOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Obanor (CPSO#: 155642 )
Business Address: 2894500359

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 23 Main Street South
WATERFORD FAMILY HEALTH CENTRE
Waterford Ontario N0E 1Y0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194436694
Fax: 5199005740

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Effective June 1, 2025, patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact:

Avalon Walk-In Medical Clinic
34 Richard William Drive
Unit #2b
Caledonia, ON
N3W 0G8
Tel: 289-450-0359
Fax: 289-860-0708
Date Received: 08 Apr 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: NCOBANOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Obanor (CPSO#: 155642 )
Business Address: 2894500359

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NNEAMAKA CLARA OBANOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBANOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NNEAMAKA CLARA OBANOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBANOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2024