THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:21:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hadhramout University of Science and Technology College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. OMAR N ALI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ali (CPSO#: 156242 )
Business Address: 110 Holmes Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2K9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Hadhramout University of Science and Technology College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. OMAR N ALI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ali (CPSO#: 156242 )
Business Address: 110 Holmes Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8S 2K9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Apr 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 17 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. OMAR N ALI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. OMAR N ALI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hadhramout University of Science and Technology College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2024