THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:10:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 146 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville Ontario L6K 1E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898374747
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Possee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Possee (CPSO#: 156450 )
Business Address: 146 Lakeshore Road West
Unit A2
Oakville Ontario L6K 1E4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 146 Lakeshore Road West
Oakville Ontario L6K 1E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2898374747
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Possee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Possee (CPSO#: 156450 )
Business Address: 146 Lakeshore Road West
Unit A2
Oakville Ontario L6K 1E4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 May 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 23 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SIMON POSSEE may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SIMON POSSEE may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sheffield University School of Medicine and Biomedical Sciences, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 May 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 May 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 May 2024