THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 17:06:15 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1100 Walkers Line
Burloak Rheumatology
Suite 401
Burlington Ontario L7N 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2868637422
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3465 Semenyk Court
The Specialist Suite
2nd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4P9
Phone: 9055668887
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 89 Queensway West
ACIR
Suite 212
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Phone: 416-907-2003
Fax: 416-907-4166

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Rheumatology
Effective: 05 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sahar Janjua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Janjua (CPSO#: 156540 )
Business Address: 1100 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7N 2G3
Business Address: 3465 Semenyk Court
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4P9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1100 Walkers Line
Burloak Rheumatology
Suite 401
Burlington Ontario L7N 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2868637422
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3465 Semenyk Court
The Specialist Suite
2nd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4P9
Phone: 9055668887
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 89 Queensway West
ACIR
Suite 212
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Phone: 416-907-2003
Fax: 416-907-4166

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Rheumatology
Effective: 05 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sahar Janjua Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Janjua (CPSO#: 156540 )
Business Address: 1100 Walkers Line
Burlington Ontario L7N 2G3
Business Address: 3465 Semenyk Court
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4P9

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Jun 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 06 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAHAR ASHRAF JANJUA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and rheumatology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. SAHAR ASHRAF JANJUA may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and rheumatology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Aga Khan University Medical College, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2024