THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 17:05:55 PM

General Information

Former Name: Aneke, Sylvia Chioma (Used Until: 27 Mar 2024)
Medical School: Ahmadu Bello University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-56 Queen Street North
Dayspring Medical Centre
Bolton Ontario L7E 2M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1905-857-9797
Fax: +1905-857-9791
Address: The Long Barrow
Integrated Care 24
Out Of Hours Service
Kingston House, Orbital Park
Willesborough England United Kingdom TN24 0GP
Phone: 01233505450
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR S NWAIZU MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nwaizu (CPSO#: 156560 )
Business Address: 77 Faust Ridge
Vaughan Ontario L0J 1C0
+13653783633

General Information

Former Name: Aneke, Sylvia Chioma (Used Until: 27 Mar 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ahmadu Bello University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-56 Queen Street North
Dayspring Medical Centre
Bolton Ontario L7E 2M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1905-857-9797
Fax: +1905-857-9791
Address: The Long Barrow
Integrated Care 24
Out Of Hours Service
Kingston House, Orbital Park
Willesborough England United Kingdom TN24 0GP
Phone: 01233505450
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR S NWAIZU MEDICAL PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nwaizu (CPSO#: 156560 )
Business Address: 77 Faust Ridge
Vaughan Ontario L0J 1C0
+13653783633

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYLVIA CHIOMA NWAIZU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWAIZU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SYLVIA CHIOMA NWAIZU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NWAIZU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ahmadu Bello University Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2024