THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:26:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HAZIM HAKMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hakmi (CPSO#: 156634 )
Business Address: 61-2967 Dundas Street West
#61
Toronto Ontario M6P 1Z2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 14 Jun 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HAZIM HAKMI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Hakmi (CPSO#: 156634 )
Business Address: 61-2967 Dundas Street West
#61
Toronto Ontario M6P 1Z2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 27 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HAZIM HAKMI may practise medicine independently in general surgery.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. HAZIM HAKMI may practise medicine independently in general surgery.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Mar 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 13 Jun 2027