THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:30:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Federal de São Paulo (UNIFESP) Faculdade de Medicina, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Hospital Eye Clinic
Ivey Eye Institute
London Ontario N6A 3N3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519-646-6266
Fax: 519-646-6267

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Ivey Eye Institute - St Joseph Hospital
(Department of Ophthalmology at the Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry at Western University)
268 Grosvenor St
London, Ontario, Canada, N6A 4V2
Tel: 519.645.8250 // 519 646-6100 ext. 66018
Date Received: 08 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andriatti Paulo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Andriatti Paulo (CPSO#: 156640 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
St. Joseph's Hospital
Ivey Eye Institute
London Ontario N6A 3N3
519 646-6100 Extn: 66018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN, PORTUGUESE, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidade Federal de São Paulo (UNIFESP) Faculdade de Medicina, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 268 Grosvenor Street
St Joseph's Hospital Eye Clinic
Ivey Eye Institute
London Ontario N6A 3N3
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 519-646-6266
Fax: 519-646-6267

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 15 Aug 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 15 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Ivey Eye Institute - St Joseph Hospital
(Department of Ophthalmology at the Schulich School of Medicine & Dentistry at Western University)
268 Grosvenor St
London, Ontario, Canada, N6A 4V2
Tel: 519.645.8250 // 519 646-6100 ext. 66018
Date Received: 08 Jan 2025

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andriatti Paulo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Andriatti Paulo (CPSO#: 156640 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
St. Joseph's Hospital
Ivey Eye Institute
London Ontario N6A 3N3
519 646-6100 Extn: 66018

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Aug 2024
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 15 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DANILO ANDRIATTI PAULO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology, Western University, in which Dr. ANDRIATTI PAULO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ANDRIATTI PAULO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ANDRIATTI PAULO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ANDRIATTI PAULO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 15 August, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. ANDRIATTI PAULO's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DANILO ANDRIATTI PAULO may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology, Western University, in which Dr. ANDRIATTI PAULO holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ANDRIATTI PAULO no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ANDRIATTI PAULO’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ANDRIATTI PAULO’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 15 August, 2024, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. ANDRIATTI PAULO's academic appointment at Western University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Federal de São Paulo (UNIFESP) Faculdade de Medicina, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027