THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/04/25 06:33:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Abia State University Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Yorkland Boulevard
Vanrose Medical Center
Brampton Ontario L6P 4B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2897482450
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 1-9441 Markham Road
FlexMD Allied Health Clinic
Markham Ontario L3P 3J3
Phone: (905) 205-1558
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 May 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IJENMA OBASI OFFIONG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Offiong (CPSO#: 157011 )
Business Address: 5 Yorkland Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6P 4B4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Abia State University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Yorkland Boulevard
Vanrose Medical Center
Brampton Ontario L6P 4B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2897482450
Fax: No Information Available
Address: unit 1-9441 Markham Road
FlexMD Allied Health Clinic
Markham Ontario L3P 3J3
Phone: (905) 205-1558
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 May 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 27 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: IJENMA OBASI OFFIONG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Offiong (CPSO#: 157011 )
Business Address: 5 Yorkland Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6P 4B4

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Jun 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 06 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. IJENMA OBASI OFFIONG may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. IJENMA OBASI OFFIONG may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Abia State University Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2024