THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:08:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: Adeloye, Adesola Adenike (Used Until: 30 Jan 2025)
Medical School: University of Ilorin College of Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1262 Don Mills Road
Verismo Health
Suite 61
Toronto Ontario M3B 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647)-948-9242
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 681 Benninger Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2E 0C9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AJIBOYE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL COPPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ajiboye (CPSO#: 157099 )
Business Address: 215 Queen Street East
Apartment 1406
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A9
2894999255

General Information

Former Name: Adeloye, Adesola Adenike (Used Until: 30 Jan 2025)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ilorin College of Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1262 Don Mills Road
Verismo Health
Suite 61
Toronto Ontario M3B 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647)-948-9242
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 681 Benninger Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2E 0C9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 May 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 07 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. AJIBOYE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL COPPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ajiboye (CPSO#: 157099 )
Business Address: 215 Queen Street East
Apartment 1406
Brampton Ontario L6W 0A9
2894999255

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADESOLA ADENIKE AJIBOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJIBOYE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADESOLA ADENIKE AJIBOYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AJIBOYE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ilorin College of Health Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 May 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 May 2024
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 May 2024