THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:24:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Zaporizhzhia State Medical University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 847 Barton Street East
Samy's Family and Wellness Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-545-0977
Fax: 905-760-2994

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jul 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.OSHIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Oshin (CPSO#: 158476 )
Business Address: 370 Martha Street
Apt 703
Burlington Ontario L7R 0G9
6477137023
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Zaporizhzhia State Medical University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 847 Barton Street East
Samy's Family and Wellness Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-545-0977
Fax: 905-760-2994

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Jul 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 10 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.OSHIN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jan 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Oshin (CPSO#: 158476 )
Business Address: 370 Martha Street
Apt 703
Burlington Ontario L7R 0G9
6477137023
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Jul 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. TEMITOPE OLUPONLE OLATUNDUN OSHIN may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. TEMITOPE OLUPONLE OLATUNDUN OSHIN may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Zaporizhzhia State Medical University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2024