THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1120 Kingston Road
Apex Medical Centre
Scarborough
Toronto Ontario M1N 1N8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 4166907111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KHIZER MEHMOOD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mehmood (CPSO#: 158855 )
Business Address:

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1120 Kingston Road
Apex Medical Centre
Scarborough
Toronto Ontario M1N 1N8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 4166907111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Aug 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 21 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KHIZER MEHMOOD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mehmood (CPSO#: 158855 )
Business Address:

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
28 Aug 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 28 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KHIZER MEHMOOD may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KHIZER MEHMOOD may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2024