THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:08:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 613-599-3321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2M 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +1 613-599-3321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 Oct 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 03 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AKINLOLU OMOLOLU FADAMIRO may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AKINLOLU OMOLOLU FADAMIRO may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos College of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2024