THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:38:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2021
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5283 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4H 2P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-264-8311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingsbridge Medical Centre
#111
Mississauga Ontario L5B
Phone: 905-507-1111
Fax: 905-890-7102
Address: 1723 Kipling Avenue
Toronto Ontario M9R 4E1
Phone: 416-244-8404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gill (CPSO#: 159080 )
Business Address: 5283 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4H 2P1
905-264-8311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2021

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5283 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4H 2P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-264-8311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingsbridge Medical Centre
#111
Mississauga Ontario L5B
Phone: 905-507-1111
Fax: 905-890-7102
Address: 1723 Kipling Avenue
Toronto Ontario M9R 4E1
Phone: 416-244-8404
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Oct 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gill (CPSO#: 159080 )
Business Address: 5283 Rutherford Road
Vaughan Ontario L4H 2P1
905-264-8311

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
30 Oct 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 30 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MANKARAN GILL may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MANKARAN GILL may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2021

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2024