THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:53:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Cardiology
585 University Ave.
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-277-6768
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Sole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sole (CPSO#: 20908 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Cardiology
585 University Ave.
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-277-6768
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Sole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sole (CPSO#: 20908 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH SOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH SOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1967
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1967

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1966