THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:25:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 229
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 848-3673
Fax: (705) 848-3449

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry W. Wannan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 229
31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake Ontario P5A 1Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 848-3673
Fax: (705) 848-3449

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barry W. Wannan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY WINSTON WANNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANNAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY WINSTON WANNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANNAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2020
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 11 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2006

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1967