THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:33:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 83 Parkside Drive
Brantford Ontario N3T 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 920 5211
Fax: (519) 759-0655
Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Extension: 2500
Fax: (519) 751-5856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven J. Richie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Richie (CPSO#: 21422 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544 Extn: 2500
Business Address: 217 Terrace Hill Street
Suite 200
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
(519) 759-0911
Business Address: 83 Parkside Dr
Brantford ON N3T 5G4
226 920 5211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 83 Parkside Drive
Brantford Ontario N3T 5G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 920 5211
Fax: (519) 759-0655
Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Extension: 2500
Fax: (519) 751-5856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven J. Richie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Richie (CPSO#: 21422 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544 Extn: 2500
Business Address: 217 Terrace Hill Street
Suite 200
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
(519) 759-0911
Business Address: 83 Parkside Dr
Brantford ON N3T 5G4
226 920 5211

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN JEROME RICHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN JEROME RICHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICHIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1967

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 20 Feb 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1968
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1970

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 1969

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1968

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1967