THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1966
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Room 7 056 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5602
Fax: (416) 864-6072
Address: Suite 906
2300 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E4
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Nov 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony F. Graham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Graham (CPSO#: 21892 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
Room 7 056 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5602
Fax: (416) 864-6072
Address: Suite 906
2300 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E4
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 21 Nov 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony F. Graham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Graham (CPSO#: 21892 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY FRANCIS GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY FRANCIS GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1966

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 09 Aug 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1969
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 1973

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 1969