THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hawthorne Place
2045 Finch Avenue West
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M3N 1M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-0811
Fax: (416) 745-0568
Address: Revera H & G Baker Centre
1 Northwestern Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J7
Phone: (416) 654-2889
Fax: (416) 654-0217
Address: Fudger House
439 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K6
Phone: (416) 392-5271
Fax: (416) 392-4174
Address: Siena Cheltenham Care Centre
5935 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y8
Phone: (416) 223-4050
Fax: (416) 223-4159

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1975
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Louis Greenspan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Greenspan (CPSO#: 21948 )
Business Address: Hawthorne Place
2045 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 1M9
(416) 745-0811
Business Address: Leisure World
5935 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y8
(416) 232-4050
Business Address: Fudger House
439 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K6
(416) 392-5271
Business Address: Revera H & G Baker Centre
1 Northwestern Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J7
(416) 654-2889

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hawthorne Place
2045 Finch Avenue West
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M3N 1M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-0811
Fax: (416) 745-0568
Address: Revera H & G Baker Centre
1 Northwestern Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J7
Phone: (416) 654-2889
Fax: (416) 654-0217
Address: Fudger House
439 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K6
Phone: (416) 392-5271
Fax: (416) 392-4174
Address: Siena Cheltenham Care Centre
5935 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y8
Phone: (416) 223-4050
Fax: (416) 223-4159

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1975
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Louis Greenspan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Greenspan (CPSO#: 21948 )
Business Address: Hawthorne Place
2045 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 1M9
(416) 745-0811
Business Address: Leisure World
5935 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M2R 1Y8
(416) 232-4050
Business Address: Fudger House
439 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K6
(416) 392-5271
Business Address: Revera H & G Baker Centre
1 Northwestern Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6M 2J7
(416) 654-2889

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL LOUIS GREENSPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENSPAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL LOUIS GREENSPAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENSPAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968