THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:12:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
14MC-427
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166035404
Fax: 4166035060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 20 Nov 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. A. M. Bookman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bookman (CPSO#: 22099 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 1E-452
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
14MC-427
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166035404
Fax: 4166035060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 20 Nov 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. A. M. Bookman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bookman (CPSO#: 22099 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 1E-452
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5404

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
21 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 21 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 12:01a.m., March 21, 2025, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Arthur Allan Melvin Bookman.

Practice Monitor
(i) Dr. Bookman shall not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise (“Professional Encounter” or “Professional Encounters”), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the “Practice Monitor” or “Practice Monitors”), and unless the other requirements provided in this Order are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Bookman must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also present.
(ii) Dr. Bookman shall inform his patients of the indication for any breast, pelvic, genital and/or rectal examination that he may perform and shall document the discussion in the corresponding patient chart.
(iii) Dr. Bookman shall remain free of any conflict of interest with the Practice Monitor.
(iv) Dr. Bookman shall review the Practice Monitor’s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.
(v) At all times, Dr. Bookman shall ensure that the Practice Monitor fulfils the obligations set out in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking, attached at Appendix “B”, including but not limited to:
a. providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis;
b. remaining present at all times during all Professional Encounters, in person or otherwise, with all patients;
c. carefully observing all of Dr. Bookman’s Professional Encounters with patients, including but not limited to physical and internal examinations, and to ensure the Practice Monitor’s view of all of Dr. Bookman’s Professional Encounters with patients, including physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at all times;
d. refraining from performing any other functions, except those required in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking, while observing Dr. Bookman in all his Professional Encounters with patients;
e. maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the form attached to this Order as Appendix “C” (the “Log”) and in the manner described in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking, including listing the indication Dr. Bookman described to his patient for any breast, pelvic, genital or rectal examination performed and confirming that Dr. Bookman has documented the discussion in the corresponding patient chart;
f. initialling all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the Log; and
g. submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly basis.
(vi) Dr. Bookman shall maintain an up-to-date copy of the Log by ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and shall make it available to the College upon request.
(vii) The College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to practice monitoring in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.
Notification of Practice Locations

(viii) Dr. Bookman shall inform the College of each and every location at which he practices, delegates or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively the “Practice Location(s)”), within five (5) days of this Order. Going forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

Posting a Sign and Translation
(ix) Dr. Bookman shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not he is physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out in Appendix “D”. If providing care in a virtual setting, Dr. Bookman display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, Dr. Bookman shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Bookman must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Bookman must not be alone during any professional encounter with any patient. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
(x) Dr. Bookman shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in which he provides services, of the sign described in (ix) above, in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Appendix “D.”
(xi) Dr. Bookman shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (x) above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order.
(xii) The College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital or other setting, in its sole discretion.

Notifying Patients
(xiii) Dr. Bookman shall ensure that each patient with whom he has a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described in (i), above.
(xiv) With respect to patients that are scheduled at least seven (7) days in advance, Dr. Bookman shall ensure that each patient is directly notified, within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details of the restriction described in (i) above.

Monitoring
(xv) Dr. Bookman shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr. Bookman’s compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information from these persons or institutions.
(xvi) Dr. Bookman shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor Dr. Bookman’s compliance with the terms of this Order.
(xvii) Dr. Bookman shall consent to the College providing any and all information to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Bookman’s compliance with the terms of this Order.
(xviii) Dr. Bookman shall consent to all Practice Monitors disclosing to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Order, relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor’s Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Bookman’s compliance with this Order.
(xix) Dr. Bookman shall consent to the College providing the Order to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location where he practices or has privileges (“Chief(s) of Staff”), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.
(xx) Dr. Bookman shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of this Order.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from 12:01a.m., March 21, 2025, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Arthur Allan Melvin Bookman.

Practice Monitor
(i) Dr. Bookman shall not engage in any professional encounters, in person or otherwise (“Professional Encounter” or “Professional Encounters”), with patients of any age, in any jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the “Practice Monitor” or “Practice Monitors”), and unless the other requirements provided in this Order are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Bookman must not be alone with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also present.
(ii) Dr. Bookman shall inform his patients of the indication for any breast, pelvic, genital and/or rectal examination that he may perform and shall document the discussion in the corresponding patient chart.
(iii) Dr. Bookman shall remain free of any conflict of interest with the Practice Monitor.
(iv) Dr. Bookman shall review the Practice Monitor’s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix “B”.
(v) At all times, Dr. Bookman shall ensure that the Practice Monitor fulfils the obligations set out in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking, attached at Appendix “B”, including but not limited to:
a. providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis;
b. remaining present at all times during all Professional Encounters, in person or otherwise, with all patients;
c. carefully observing all of Dr. Bookman’s Professional Encounters with patients, including but not limited to physical and internal examinations, and to ensure the Practice Monitor’s view of all of Dr. Bookman’s Professional Encounters with patients, including physical and internal examinations, is unobstructed at all times;
d. refraining from performing any other functions, except those required in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking, while observing Dr. Bookman in all his Professional Encounters with patients;
e. maintaining a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the form attached to this Order as Appendix “C” (the “Log”) and in the manner described in the Practice Monitor’s undertaking, including listing the indication Dr. Bookman described to his patient for any breast, pelvic, genital or rectal examination performed and confirming that Dr. Bookman has documented the discussion in the corresponding patient chart;
f. initialling all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted in the Log; and
g. submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly basis.
(vi) Dr. Bookman shall maintain an up-to-date copy of the Log by ensuring a copy is made at the end of each business day, and shall make it available to the College upon request.
(vii) The College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to practice monitoring in a hospital setting, in its sole discretion.
Notification of Practice Locations

(viii) Dr. Bookman shall inform the College of each and every location at which he practices, delegates or has privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which he is affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively the “Practice Location(s)”), within five (5) days of this Order. Going forward, he shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

Posting a Sign and Translation
(ix) Dr. Bookman shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, at all times whether or not he is physically present at the Practice Location, in the form set out in Appendix “D”. If providing care in a virtual setting, Dr. Bookman display the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. If the patient encounter is by telephone, Dr. Bookman shall read the sign to the patient at the outset of the patient encounter. For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: “Dr. Bookman must not have professional encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous presence and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. Bookman must not be alone during any professional encounter with any patient. Further information may be found on the College website at www.cpso.on.ca”.
(x) Dr. Bookman shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in which he provides services, of the sign described in (ix) above, in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Appendix “D.”
(xi) Dr. Bookman shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (x) above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order.
(xii) The College may accept an alternative arrangement with respect to signage in a hospital or other setting, in its sole discretion.

Notifying Patients
(xiii) Dr. Bookman shall ensure that each patient with whom he has a Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional Encounter, of the details of the restriction described in (i), above.
(xiv) With respect to patients that are scheduled at least seven (7) days in advance, Dr. Bookman shall ensure that each patient is directly notified, within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details of the restriction described in (i) above.

Monitoring
(xv) Dr. Bookman shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr. Bookman’s compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information from these persons or institutions.
(xvi) Dr. Bookman shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor Dr. Bookman’s compliance with the terms of this Order.
(xvii) Dr. Bookman shall consent to the College providing any and all information to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Bookman’s compliance with the terms of this Order.
(xviii) Dr. Bookman shall consent to all Practice Monitors disclosing to the College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Order, relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor’s Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Bookman’s compliance with this Order.
(xix) Dr. Bookman shall consent to the College providing the Order to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location where he practices or has privileges (“Chief(s) of Staff”), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.
(xx) Dr. Bookman shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of this Order.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 27 Feb 2025
Hearing Date(s): Merits; May 14, 15, 20, 23, 26 & June 18, 19, 2025

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 21 Mar 2025
Summary:
Interim Order

Effective March 21, 2025,  the Inquiries, Complaints and Report Committee (ICRC) made an interim order directing the Registrar to impose terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration of Dr. Arthur Allan Melvin Bookman under s. 25.4(6).

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 27 Feb 2025
Hearing Date(s): Merits; May 14, 15, 20, 23, 26 & June 18, 19, 2025

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 21 Mar 2025
Summary:
Interim Order

Effective March 21, 2025,  the Inquiries, Complaints and Report Committee (ICRC) made an interim order directing the Registrar to impose terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration of Dr. Arthur Allan Melvin Bookman under s. 25.4(6).

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee. Effective: 21 Mar 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1968