THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3958 Petrolia Line
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 331-0498
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Buckton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Buckton (CPSO#: 22137 )
Business Address: 109 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
(519) 332-2715

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3958 Petrolia Line
Petrolia Ontario N0N 1R0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519 331-0498
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1988
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Buckton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Buckton (CPSO#: 22137 )
Business Address: 109 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
(519) 332-2715

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALFRED BUCKTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM ALFRED BUCKTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1968
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1969

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1968