THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 540
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 960-5883
Fax: (416) 960-9877

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hartley Garfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Garfield (CPSO#: 22658 )
Business Address: Suite 540
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 960-5883

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 540
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 960-5883
Fax: (416) 960-9877

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 04 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hartley Garfield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Garfield (CPSO#: 22658 )
Business Address: Suite 540
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 960-5883

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARTLEY ARTHUR GARFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARFIELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARTLEY ARTHUR GARFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARFIELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1968

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1969
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 1969