THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:29:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1965
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 310
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 926-1486
Fax: (416) 926-0091

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 18 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Easterbrook Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Easterbrook (CPSO#: 22726 )
Business Address: 310 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 926-1486

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 310
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 926-1486
Fax: (416) 926-0091

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 18 Nov 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Easterbrook Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Easterbrook (CPSO#: 22726 )
Business Address: 310 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
(416) 926-1486

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM MICHAEL EASTERBROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASTERBROOK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM MICHAEL EASTERBROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASTERBROOK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1965

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1966
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1970

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1967

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1966

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1965