THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B-262 Main St N
Markham ON L3P 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052941331
Fax: 9052941331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. MacDonald (CPSO#: 22758 )
Business Address: 262B Main Street North
Markham Ontario L3P 1Y7
(905) 294-1331

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: B-262 Main St N
Markham ON L3P 1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052941331
Fax: 9052941331

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. MacDonald (CPSO#: 22758 )
Business Address: 262B Main Street North
Markham Ontario L3P 1Y7
(905) 294-1331

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN LEE MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN LEE MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1969
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1969