THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:04:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Kern Rd
North York ON M3B 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164473438
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dawson (CPSO#: 22804 )
Business Address: 21 Kern Rd
North York ON M3B 1S9
(905) 884-6450
Business Address: 1070 Major Mackenzie Dr E
Unit E
Richmond Hill ON L4S 1P3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Kern Rd
North York ON M3B 1S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164473438
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Dawson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dawson (CPSO#: 22804 )
Business Address: 21 Kern Rd
North York ON M3B 1S9
(905) 884-6450
Business Address: 1070 Major Mackenzie Dr E
Unit E
Richmond Hill ON L4S 1P3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MACDOUGALL DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MACDOUGALL DAWSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1969