THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:39:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 405
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-2456
Fax: (416) 741-2454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Mar 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Mar 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abraham Chaiton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chaiton (CPSO#: 22831 )
Business Address: 2115 Finch Avenue West
Ste 405
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V6
4167412456

Corporation Name: Dr. Abraham Chaiton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 405
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 741-2456
Fax: (416) 741-2454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Mar 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 13 Mar 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 07 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abraham Chaiton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chaiton (CPSO#: 22831 )
Business Address: 2115 Finch Avenue West
Ste 405
Toronto Ontario M3N 2V6
4167412456

Corporation Name: Dr. Abraham Chaiton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM CHAITON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAITON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM CHAITON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAITON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1970
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1970

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 1970

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1969