THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:44:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8574
Fax: (613) 739-6645

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 05 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Leonard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Leonard (CPSO#: 23552 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8574
Business Address: 557 Echo Dr
Ottawa ON K1S 1N8
6133716303

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8574
Fax: (613) 739-6645

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 05 Nov 1975
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1975
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Leonard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Leonard (CPSO#: 23552 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Eye Institute
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8574
Business Address: 557 Echo Dr
Ottawa ON K1S 1N8
6133716303

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN CLARK LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN CLARK LEONARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEONARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Nov 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1976

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 1974

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1970