THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:52:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 North Service Road West
Oakville Ontario L6M 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-3730
Fax: (905) 338-3731

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. S. Rennie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300 North Service Road West
Oakville Ontario L6M 2S2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 338-3730
Fax: (905) 338-3731

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. S. Rennie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES STUART RENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENNIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES STUART RENNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RENNIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 24 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 24 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1981

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 1980

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1977

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 1976

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1975

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1970