THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 02:30:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 410
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 964-2220
Fax: (416) 964-5649

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Mar 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 30 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel E. Maser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maser (CPSO#: 23628 )
Business Address: 1366 Yonge Street
Suite 410
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
(416) 964-2220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 410
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 964-2220
Fax: (416) 964-5649

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Mar 1976
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 30 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel E. Maser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Maser (CPSO#: 23628 )
Business Address: 1366 Yonge Street
Suite 410
Toronto Ontario M4T 3A7
(416) 964-2220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL ELLIOT MASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOEL ELLIOT MASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1970