THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:55:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, YIDDISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-95 Bayly Street West
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-6422
Fax: 9056836548

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Sliwowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sliwowicz (CPSO#: 23651 )
Business Address: Suite 303
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
(416) 386-6422

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, YIDDISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-95 Bayly Street West
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-6422
Fax: 9056836548

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Sliwowicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Sliwowicz (CPSO#: 23651 )
Business Address: Suite 303
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax Ontario L1S 7K8
(416) 386-6422

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SLIWOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLIWOWICZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID SLIWOWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SLIWOWICZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 06 Feb 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 1972

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 1972

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1970