THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH, GERMAN, INDONESIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-4356
Fax: (519) 258-9918

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tiang-Ham Liem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Liem (CPSO#: 23721 )
Business Address: Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
Unit D
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2G1
(519) 258-4356

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH, GERMAN, INDONESIAN
Medical School: Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-4356
Fax: (519) 258-9918

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1970
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1970
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tiang-Ham Liem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Liem (CPSO#: 23721 )
Business Address: Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
Unit D
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 2G1
(519) 258-4356

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIANG-HAM LIEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIANG-HAM LIEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1971
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1968
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1971

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 1968