THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:16:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1969
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 72 King Street West
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-2501
Fax: (905) 662-4100

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bashir Khambalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khambalia (CPSO#: 24902 )
Business Address: 72 King Street West
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 1H8
(905) 662-2501

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, SWAHILI
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 72 King Street West
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-2501
Fax: (905) 662-4100

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bashir Khambalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khambalia (CPSO#: 24902 )
Business Address: 72 King Street West
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 1H8
(905) 662-2501

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASHIR KHAMBALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAMBALIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASHIR KHAMBALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAMBALIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1969

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1972
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1969
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1972

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1972

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1972

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 1969