THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:43:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
RM 1NW-126
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Russell Tanzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tanzer (CPSO#: 25669 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6001

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
RM 1NW-126
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6001
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Russell Tanzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tanzer (CPSO#: 25669 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6001

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL SHELDON TANZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANZER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUSSELL SHELDON TANZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANZER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1972
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1972