THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Center
2550A Finch Avenue West
Weston Ontario M9M 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 749-5291
Fax: (416) 749-6598

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1976
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Harold Isenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Isenberg (CPSO#: 60031 ) Dr. R. Libman (CPSO#: 25680 )
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(905) 897-9228

Corporation Name: Libman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Libman (CPSO#: 25680 ) Dr. E. Libman (CPSO#: 32713 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Medical Center
2550A Finch Avenue West
Weston Ontario M9M 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 749-5291
Fax: (416) 749-6598

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1976
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Harold Isenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Isenberg (CPSO#: 60031 ) Dr. R. Libman (CPSO#: 25680 )
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(905) 897-9228

Corporation Name: Libman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Libman (CPSO#: 25680 ) Dr. E. Libman (CPSO#: 32713 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT NELSON LIBMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT NELSON LIBMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIBMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1973
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1973