THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:47:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 694-1400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Morris Rotbard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rotbard (CPSO#: 25691 )
Business Address: 202 - 521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5H1
(416) 694-1400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 694-1400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Aug 1989
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 04 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Morris Rotbard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rotbard (CPSO#: 25691 )
Business Address: 202 - 521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5H1
(416) 694-1400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MORRIS ROTBARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTBARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MORRIS ROTBARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTBARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1972