THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:53:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Johns Hopkins University, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Group
Unit 4, 2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 695-8900
Fax: (613) 695-8901

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Shaver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shaver (CPSO#: 25817 )
Business Address: Appletree
1582 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7E5
(613) 731-6620
Business Address: Appletree Medical Group
Unit 4, 2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2E 3K2
(613) 695-8900
Business Address: Box 11063, Station H
Ottawa Ontario K2H 7T8
(613) 825-1147

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: The Johns Hopkins University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Appletree Medical Group
Unit 4, 2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 9S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 695-8900
Fax: (613) 695-8901

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1974
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1974
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Shaver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Shaver (CPSO#: 25817 )
Business Address: Appletree
1582 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7E5
(613) 731-6620
Business Address: Appletree Medical Group
Unit 4, 2150 Robertson Road
Ottawa Ontario K2E 3K2
(613) 695-8900
Business Address: Box 11063, Station H
Ottawa Ontario K2H 7T8
(613) 825-1147

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
30 Apr 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 30 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 30, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Charles Stuart
Shaver, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Shaver to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. CHARLES STUART SHAVER
("Dr. Shaver")

to

THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")




A. PREAMBLE

(1) I, Dr. Shaver, certificate of registration number 25817, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

(2) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
bearing File Number 7214695 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct or am incompetent in my practice of
Cardiology, including the interpretation of resting and stress ECGs.

B. UNDERTAKING

(3) I, Dr. Shaver, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this
Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

(4) I, Dr. Shaver, executed an Undertaking with the College on April 22, 2014
(the "April 22, 2014 Undertaking"), which replaced and superseded an
undertaking I executed with the College on February 13, 2013 in
resolution of an investigation into my practice (the "February 13, 2013
Undertaking"). Once signed, this Undertaking replaces and supersedes the
April 22, 2014 Undertaking.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that I will restrict my medical practice
to ambulatory outpatient internal medicine.

(b) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake and agree not to supervise stress tests
and nuclear stress tests, or to interpret ECGs in respect of any
patient.

(c) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake and agree that I shall not seek privileges
at any hospital in any jurisdiction.

(d) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake and agree that I shall not supervise
medical residents.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location that I practise including, but not limited to clinic(s)
and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
Location(s)"), within 15 days of executing this Undertaking. Going
forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all
new Practice Locations within 15 days of commencing practice at
that location.

(b) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Shaver, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or
any person or institution that may have relevant information, in
order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of
this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".

(7) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of this
Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College (the "Discipline Committee").

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which
is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,
c. 18, as amended.

(11) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
posted in accordance with section (10) above, the following summary shall
be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Shaver's practice is restricted to ambulatory outpatient
internal medicine. Dr. Shaver agrees not to supervise stress tests
and nuclear stress tests, or interpret ECGs in respect of any
patient. Dr. Shaver agrees not to seek hospital privileges and
shall not supervise medical residents.

D. CONSENT

(12) I, Dr. Shaver, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
Practice Location, with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from April 30, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Charles Stuart
Shaver, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Shaver to
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. CHARLES STUART SHAVER
("Dr. Shaver")

to

THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")




A. PREAMBLE

(1) I, Dr. Shaver, certificate of registration number 25817, am a member of
the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
of practice.

(2) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
bearing File Number 7214695 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
in professional misconduct or am incompetent in my practice of
Cardiology, including the interpretation of resting and stress ECGs.

B. UNDERTAKING

(3) I, Dr. Shaver, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this
Undertaking from the date on which I sign it.

(4) I, Dr. Shaver, executed an Undertaking with the College on April 22, 2014
(the "April 22, 2014 Undertaking"), which replaced and superseded an
undertaking I executed with the College on February 13, 2013 in
resolution of an investigation into my practice (the "February 13, 2013
Undertaking"). Once signed, this Undertaking replaces and supersedes the
April 22, 2014 Undertaking.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that I will restrict my medical practice
to ambulatory outpatient internal medicine.

(b) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake and agree not to supervise stress tests
and nuclear stress tests, or to interpret ECGs in respect of any
patient.

(c) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake and agree that I shall not seek privileges
at any hospital in any jurisdiction.

(d) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake and agree that I shall not supervise
medical residents.

(6) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location that I practise including, but not limited to clinic(s)
and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
Location(s)"), within 15 days of executing this Undertaking. Going
forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all
new Practice Locations within 15 days of commencing practice at
that location.

(b) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
monitoring my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Shaver, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or
any person or institution that may have relevant information, in
order for the College to monitor my compliance with the terms of
this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".

(7) I, Dr. Shaver, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of this
Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee of the College (the "Discipline Committee").

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which
is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,
c. 18, as amended.

(11) I, Dr. Shaver, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
posted in accordance with section (10) above, the following summary shall
be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Shaver's practice is restricted to ambulatory outpatient
internal medicine. Dr. Shaver agrees not to supervise stress tests
and nuclear stress tests, or interpret ECGs in respect of any
patient. Dr. Shaver agrees not to seek hospital privileges and
shall not supervise medical residents.

D. CONSENT

(12) I, Dr. Shaver, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
Practice Location, with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 30 Apr 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles Stuart Shaver to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 30, 2018:

Dr. Shaver’s practice is restricted to ambulatory outpatient internal medicine. Dr. Shaver agrees not to supervise stress tests and nuclear stress tests, or interpret ECGs in respect of any patient. Dr. Shaver agrees not to seek hospital privileges and shall not supervise medical residents.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 30 Apr 2018
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Charles Stuart Shaver to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 30, 2018:

Dr. Shaver’s practice is restricted to ambulatory outpatient internal medicine. Dr. Shaver agrees not to supervise stress tests and nuclear stress tests, or interpret ECGs in respect of any patient. Dr. Shaver agrees not to seek hospital privileges and shall not supervise medical residents.

Training

Medical School: The Johns Hopkins University, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 30 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 22 Apr 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1973

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1970