THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: English Conjoint Board, 1970
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Patterson (CPSO#: 26179 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: English Conjoint Board, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Patterson (CPSO#: 26179 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: English Conjoint Board, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1971
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 1971