THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:05:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: Usher-Owen, Ann Kathryn (Used Until: 06 Nov 1997)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1972
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
B2424- 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8338
Fax: (519) 685-8080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 17 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. K. Usher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Usher (CPSO#: 26490 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
519-685-8338

Corporation Name: Dr. A. K. Usher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jun 2021

General Information

Former Name: Usher-Owen, Ann Kathryn (Used Until: 06 Nov 1997)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
B2424- 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8338
Fax: (519) 685-8080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 17 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. K. Usher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Usher (CPSO#: 26490 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
519-685-8338

Corporation Name: Dr. A. K. Usher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jun 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANN KATHRYN USHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. USHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANN KATHRYN USHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. USHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1974