THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:51:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 124
2 Poyntz Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-8270
Fax: (705) 549-8554

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Woods Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Woods (CPSO#: 26513 )
Business Address: unit 124-2 Poyntz Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1L9
7055498270

Corporation Name: Donald Woods Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 124
2 Poyntz Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 549-8270
Fax: (705) 549-8554

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Woods Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Woods (CPSO#: 26513 )
Business Address: unit 124-2 Poyntz Street
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1L9
7055498270

Corporation Name: Donald Woods Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD BARRY WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD BARRY WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1974
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1974

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1973