THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:54:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Malta Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2019
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Thompson Crescent
East Wellington Family Health Team
Erin Ontario N0B 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 833-9396
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 649 Scottsdale Drive
Parkview Family Practice
Suite 300
Guelph Ontario N1G 4T7
Phone: 519-837-8137
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karina Hilferink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hilferink (CPSO#: 267640 )
Business Address: 80 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2E2
Business Address: 6 Thompson Crescent
East Wellington Family Health Team
Erin Ontario N0B 1T0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Malta Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2019

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Thompson Crescent
East Wellington Family Health Team
Erin Ontario N0B 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 833-9396
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 649 Scottsdale Drive
Parkview Family Practice
Suite 300
Guelph Ontario N1G 4T7
Phone: 519-837-8137
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Sep 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karina Hilferink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hilferink (CPSO#: 267640 )
Business Address: 80 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2E2
Business Address: 6 Thompson Crescent
East Wellington Family Health Team
Erin Ontario N0B 1T0

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Sep 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 29 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KARINA FREDA VERA HILFERINK may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. KARINA FREDA VERA HILFERINK may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Malta Faculty of Medicine and Surgery, 2019

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2024