THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:15:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St. Vincent and the Grenadines, 2020
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 125 Hogan Road
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18078875252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Massei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Massei (CPSO#: 267909 )
Business Address: 125 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St. Vincent and the Grenadines, 2020

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 125 Hogan Road
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 18078875252
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Sep 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Massei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Massei (CPSO#: 267909 )
Business Address: 125 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Sep 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 17 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL MASSEI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MICHAEL MASSEI may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St. Vincent and the Grenadines, 2020

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2024
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2024