THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:03:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, HUNGARIAN, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 178 John Street
Suite 305
Brampton Ontario L6W 2A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-2172
Fax: (905) 456-2173

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Paul Joza and Eva Joza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Joza (CPSO#: 28472 ) Dr. P. Joza (CPSO#: 27137 )
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 200 - 178 John Street
Brampton Ontario L6V 4H6
(905) 451-1937
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: 200-60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
(905) 451-1937
Business Address: 305-178 John St
Brampton ON L6W 2A4
9054562172

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH, HUNGARIAN, RUSSIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 178 John Street
Suite 305
Brampton Ontario L6W 2A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-2172
Fax: (905) 456-2173

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 1977
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1977
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Paul Joza and Eva Joza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Aug 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Joza (CPSO#: 28472 ) Dr. P. Joza (CPSO#: 27137 )
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 200 - 178 John Street
Brampton Ontario L6V 4H6
(905) 451-1937
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 494-2120
Business Address: 200-60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton Ontario L6X 0Z9
(905) 451-1937
Business Address: 305-178 John St
Brampton ON L6W 2A4
9054562172

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1974
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 1974