THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:13:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Nuclear Medicine
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3424
Fax: (519) 667-3734
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Nuclear Medicine
268 Grovenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 64328
Fax: (519) 646-6135
Address: Woodstock General Hospital
Nuclear Medicine
310 Julianna Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Extension: 2026
Fax: (519) 421-4241

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Vezina (CPSO#: 27226 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100 Extn: 64328
Business Address: 310 Julianna Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
(519) 421-4211 Extn: 2026
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Nuclear Medicine
Victorial Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 663-3424

Corporation Name: Romsa Warrington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Mar 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Nuclear Medicine
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3424
Fax: (519) 667-3734
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Nuclear Medicine
268 Grovenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 64328
Fax: (519) 646-6135
Address: Woodstock General Hospital
Nuclear Medicine
310 Julianna Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Extension: 2026
Fax: (519) 421-4241

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 15 Nov 1978
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1978
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Vezina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Vezina (CPSO#: 27226 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6100 Extn: 64328
Business Address: 310 Julianna Drive
Woodstock Ontario N4V 0A4
(519) 421-4211 Extn: 2026
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Nuclear Medicine
Victorial Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 663-3424

Corporation Name: Romsa Warrington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Mar 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM COLIN VEZINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEZINA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM COLIN VEZINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VEZINA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1975
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 1975