THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:49:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 778-1496
Fax: (416) 778-1400
Address: Collingwood General and Marine
Hospital
Community Mental Health Centre
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 444-6600
Fax: (705) 444-5131

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. T. Kiraly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kiraly (CPSO#: 27366 )
Business Address: East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1N4
(416) 778-1496

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 778-1496
Fax: (416) 778-1400
Address: Collingwood General and Marine
Hospital
Community Mental Health Centre
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 444-6600
Fax: (705) 444-5131

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. T. Kiraly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kiraly (CPSO#: 27366 )
Business Address: East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4J 1N4
(416) 778-1496

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE TAMAS KIRALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRALY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LESLIE TAMAS KIRALY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIRALY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1974