THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:05:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 549-1244
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1976
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levy (CPSO#: 27374 )
Business Address: 401-1 Young St
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
905 549-1244
Business Address: 1390 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1C1
(905) 549-1244
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
905 549-1244
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
905 549-1244
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
905 549-1244
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
905 549-1244
Business Address: 251 Parkdale Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8H 5X6
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 549-1244
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1976
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1976
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Levy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levy (CPSO#: 27374 )
Business Address: 401-1 Young St
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
905 549-1244
Business Address: 1390 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1C1
(905) 549-1244
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
905 549-1244
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
905 549-1244
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
905 549-1244
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
905 549-1244
Business Address: 251 Parkdale Avenue North
Hamilton Ontario L8H 5X6
Business Address: 1 Young St
Suite 401
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD MURRAY LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD MURRAY LEVY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1974